This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 08:13:43 (UTC).

Tang vs Wilkinson

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Tang filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Wilkinson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tang, Trizzie T

Defendant

Wilkinson, Alissa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Achord, David T.

4025 Camino Del Rio S Unit 300

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

Farmer, John T

402 W Broadway Unit 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Tang, Trizzie T. Refers to: Wilkinson, Alissa

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tang, Trizzie T. Refers to: Wilkinson, Alissa

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Tang, Trizzie T. Refers to: Wilkinson, Alissa

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Wilkinson, Alissa.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Wilkinson, Alissa. Filed By: Wilkinson, Alissa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Tang, Trizzie T. Refers to: Wilkinson, Alissa Filed By: Tang, Trizzie T (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/25/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Tang, Trizzie T. Refers to: Wilkinson, Alissa Filed By: Tang, Trizzie T (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tang, Trizzie T. Refers to: Wilkinson, Alissa Filed By: Tang, Trizzie T (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Tang, Trizzie T. Refers to: Wilkinson, Alissa Filed By: Tang, Trizzie T (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARMER JOHN