Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 20:51:44 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK vs MANRIQUEZ

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MANRIQUEZ. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

MANRIQUEZ, BEATRIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Simonson, Todd C

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX A P C

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: MANRIQUEZ, BEATRIZ

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: MANRIQUEZ, BEATRIZ

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: MANRIQUEZ, BEATRIZ

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: MANRIQUEZ, BEATRIZ

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/12/2020.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: MANRIQUEZ, BEATRIZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: MANRIQUEZ, BEATRIZ Filed By: SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/12/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: MANRIQUEZ, BEATRIZ Filed By: SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: MANRIQUEZ, BEATRIZ Filed By: SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: MANRIQUEZ, BEATRIZ Filed By: SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 903.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Venue filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: MANRIQUEZ, BEATRIZ Filed By: SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less