This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:07:01 (UTC).

SWVP MONTEREY LLC vs CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720

Case Summary

On 11/04/2016 SWVP MONTEREY LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWVP MONTEREY LLC

Defendants

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720

CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY

HOUSTON CASUALTY COMPANY

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ENGLISH, DONALD A

Attorney at ENGLISH & GLOVEN

12770 El Camino Real Suite 210

San Diego, CA 92130

YEE, CHRISTY I

Attorney at ENGLISH & GLOVEN

12770 El Camino Real Suite 210

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant Attorney

CHURAN, AMY M

Century Plaza Towers, 2049 Century Park E

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Linda Pool, CSR#8941) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

First Amended Complaint for: (1) Breach of Contract; (2) Breach of the Implied Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing; and (3) Declaratory Relief

Amended Complaint (First) filed by SWVP MONTEREY LLC. Refers to: Lexington Insurance Company; Houston Casualty Company; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720; ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310; CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (First Amended Complaint) filed by SWVP MONTEREY LLC.

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720; CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY; Houston Casualty Company; Lexington Insurance Company.

Notice of Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery filed by ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC; Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number 507/N11NA01490; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720; CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY; Houston Casualty Company; Lexington Insurance Company.

Declartion of Jennifer W. Leland ISO Motion to Compel

Declaration - Other (Declartion of Jennifer W. Leland) filed by ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC; Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number 507/N11NA01490; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720; CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY; Houston Casualty Company; Lexington Insurance Company.

Separate Statment ISO Motion to Compel

Statement - Other (Separate Statment ISO Motion to Compel) filed by ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC; Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number 507/N11NA01490; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720; CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY; Houston Casualty Company; Lexington Insurance Company.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (MARGARET SMITH, CSR#9733) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 04/20/2018 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720; CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY; Houston Casualty Company; Lexington Insurance Company.

Ex Parte Application for Order Vacating the Hearing for Defendants' Combined Five-in-One Motion to

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Ex Parte Application for Order Vacating the Hearing for Defendants' Combined Five-in-One Motion to) filed by SWVP MONTEREY LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by SWVP MONTEREY LLC.

Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel

Opposition - Other (Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel) filed by SWVP MONTEREY LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by SWVP MONTEREY LLC.

Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Vacating Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel

Opposition - Other (Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Vacating Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel) filed by ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720; CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY; Houston Casualty Company; Lexington Insurance Company.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/25/2018 08:30:00 AM.

Answer of Defendants Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. 507/n13na01720, Policy No. 507/n12na01310, and Policy No. 507nl 1na01490, Allied World Assurance Company (U.s.) Inc., Houston Casualty Company,

Answer filed by ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720; CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY; Houston Casualty Company; Lexington Insurance Company; Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number 507/N11NA01490.

Notice of Motion for Order Compelling Third Party Noble House Hotels & Resorts, LTD to Comply with Subpoena

Motion to Compel Discovery filed by ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720; CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY; Houston Casualty Company; Lexington Insurance Company.

184 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by SWVP MONTEREY LLC. Filed By: SWVP MONTEREY LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by SWVP MONTEREY LLC. Filed By: SWVP MONTEREY LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to SWVP MONTEREY LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Lexington Insurance Company.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Houston Casualty Company.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by SWVP MONTEREY LLC. Filed By: SWVP MONTEREY LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
259 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Pollack, Gregory W to Eddie Sturgeon effective 11/29/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/14/2017 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/14/2017 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by SWVP MONTEREY LLC. Refers to: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720; ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC; Houston Casualty Company; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310; CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY; Lexington Insurance Company Filed By: SWVP MONTEREY LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by SWVP MONTEREY LLC. Refers to: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720; ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC; Houston Casualty Company; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310; CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY; Lexington Insurance Company Filed By: SWVP MONTEREY LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by SWVP MONTEREY LLC. Refers to: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N13NA01720; ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC; Houston Casualty Company; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 507/N12NA01310; CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY; Lexington Insurance Company; Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number 507/N11NA01490 Filed By: SWVP MONTEREY LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER B1180D190825/1197JK is a litigant

Latest cases where Houston Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Allied World Assurance Company is a litigant