This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/12/2022 at 09:10:41 (UTC).

Swenson vs Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Swenson filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWENSON, SCOTT

Defendant

Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smaili, Jihad M.

600 W Santa Ana Boulevard 202

Santa Ana, CA 92701

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by SWENSON, SCOTT. Refers to: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by SWENSON, SCOTT. Refers to: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (DENIED) filed by SWENSON, SCOTT.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

FW006

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Order on Court Fee Waiver

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute

[A document for ROA# 13]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by SWENSON, SCOTT. Refers to: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by SWENSON, SCOTT. Refers to: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP; Filed By: SWENSON, SCOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 13]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 13]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 13]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 13]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 13]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 13]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/18/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Sturgeon, Eddie C to John Meyer effective 06/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (DENIED) filed by SWENSON, SCOTT.; Filed By: SWENSON, SCOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by SWENSON, SCOTT.; Filed By: SWENSON, SCOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by SWENSON, SCOTT. Refers to: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP; Filed By: SWENSON, SCOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by SWENSON, SCOTT. Refers to: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP; Filed By: SWENSON, SCOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMAILI JIHAD M.