Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/16/2021 at 12:16:15 (UTC).

Jessica Sweeney vs Virginia Ruth Hennings

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 Jessica Sweeney filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Virginia Ruth Hennings. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Hennings, Jessica

Sweeney, Jessica

Respondents

Bragg, Sherrill Ann

Hennings, Virginia Ruth

Hennings, Deborah Sue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Norris, David

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID BAXTER NORRIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-61; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Sweeney, Jessica. Filed By: Sweeney, Jessica (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to stipulation to 03/25/2021 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/07/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered Virginia Ruth Hennings, Sherrill Ann Bragg dismissed without prejudice from the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 01/07/2021 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 07/23/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Sweeney, Jessica. Filed By: Sweeney, Jessica (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (unsuccessful service) filed by Hennings, Jessica. Refers to: Bragg, Sherrill Filed By: Sweeney, Jessica (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Hennings, Jessica. Refers to: Hennings, Virginia Filed By: Sweeney, Jessica (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Hennings, Jessica. Refers to: Hennings, Deborah Filed By: Sweeney, Jessica (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Hennings, Jessica. Refers to: Sweeney, Connor; Sweeney, Theodor; Sweeney, Yetta; Hennings, Deborah; Hennings, Virginia; Bragg, Sherrill Filed By: Sweeney, Jessica (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hennings, Jessica. Refers to: Sweeney, Connor; Sweeney, Theodor; Sweeney, Yetta; Hennings, Deborah; Hennings, Virginia; Bragg, Sherrill Filed By: Sweeney, Jessica (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Hennings, Jessica. Filed By: Sweeney, Jessica (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Hennings, Jessica. Filed By: Sweeney, Jessica (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/24/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less