This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 08:14:56 (UTC).

SUPERIOR READY MIX CONCRETE LP VS RANCHO PAVING INC

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 SUPERIOR READY MIX CONCRETE LP filed an Other lawsuit against RANCHO PAVING INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP

Defendants

Monzon, Guadalupe Avila

Rancho Paving Inc

Target Corporation

Tesla Motors Inc

The Office and Professional Employees International Union Local No 30

US Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Veldkamp, Arnold

1564 W Mission Rd

Escondido, CA 92029

 

Court Documents

Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.

Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Rancho Paving Inc; Monzon, Guadalupe; Target Corporation; Tesla Motors Inc; The Office and Professional Employees International Union Local No 30; US Specialty Insurance Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Rancho Paving Inc; Monzon, Guadalupe; Target Corporation; Tesla Motors Inc; The Office and Professional Employees International Union Local No 30; US Specialty Insurance Company

Complaint

Complaint filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Rancho Paving Inc; Monzon, Guadalupe; Target Corporation; Tesla Motors Inc; The Office and Professional Employees International Union Local No 30; US Specialty Insurance Company

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Target Corporation and Tesla Motors Inc ONLY) filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Target Corporation; Tesla Motors Inc

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/15/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to US Specialty Insurance Company.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Rancho Paving Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Monzon, Guadalupe Avila .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to The Office and Professional Employees International Union Local No 30.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Target Corporation and Tesla Motors Inc ONLY) filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Target Corporation; Tesla Motors Inc Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Target Corporation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Tesla Motors Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Rancho Paving Inc; Monzon, Guadalupe; Target Corporation; Tesla Motors Inc; The Office and Professional Employees International Union Local No 30; US Specialty Insurance Company Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/15/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Rancho Paving Inc; Monzon, Guadalupe; Target Corporation; Tesla Motors Inc; The Office and Professional Employees International Union Local No 30; US Specialty Insurance Company Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Rancho Paving Inc; Monzon, Guadalupe; Target Corporation; Tesla Motors Inc; The Office and Professional Employees International Union Local No 30; US Specialty Insurance Company Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Tesla Motors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant