This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/11/2022 at 08:09:40 (UTC).

Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP vs Montero Acuna

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Montero Acuna. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP

Defendants

Gonzalez, Eric

Montero Acuna, Aracely

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Veldkamp, Arnold

201-205 W Mission Ave

Escondido, CA 92025

 

Court Documents

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Declaration - Other

[Another document for ROA# 26]

Application for Entry of Judgment

[Another document for ROA# 26]

Application for Entry of Judgment

[Another document for ROA# 26]

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP rejected on 03/25/2022. Refers to: Montero Acuna, Aracely; Gonzalez, Eric

Declaration - Other

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Gonzalez, Eric

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Montero Acuna, Aracely

Declaration - Other

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 20]

Application for Entry of Judgment

[Another document for ROA# 20]

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court (Not Entered) submitted by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP rejected on 03/07/2022.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Montero Acuna, Aracely; Gonzalez, Eric

Declaration - Other

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Request for Dismissal of Does

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Request for Entry of Default

[Another document for ROA# 15]

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 26]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 26]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 26]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court submitted by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP rejected on 03/25/2022. Refers to: Montero Acuna, Aracely; Gonzalez, Eric; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Gonzalez, Eric; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Montero Acuna, Aracely; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Montero Acuna, Aracely; Gonzalez, Eric; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Gonzalez, Eric; Montero Acuna, Aracely; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court (Not Filed) filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Gonzalez, Eric; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Montero Acuna, Aracely; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Montero Acuna, Aracely; Gonzalez, Eric; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Montero Acuna, Aracely; Gonzalez, Eric; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Montero Acuna, Aracely; Gonzalez, Eric; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Veldkamp, Arnold L