This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/15/2018 at 13:29:30 (UTC).

Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP vs Johnson

Case Summary

On 10/26/2016 Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP filed an Other lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUPERIOR READY MIX CONCRETE LP

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JOHNSON, DAVID KERRY

FOCHT, MATTHEW

FOCHT, JILLIAN

CHAPMAN, KYLE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FOCHT, MATTHEW

FOCHT, JILLIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VELDKAMP, ARNOLD L

1508 W Mission Rd

Escondido, CA 92029

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

VAN BLARCOM, DOUGLAS J

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

101 W Broadway 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

GRAVES, DAVID WILLIAM

613 West Valley Parkway 310

Escondido, CA 92025

GINELLA, MARK A

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GRAVES, DAVID WILLIAM

613 West Valley Parkway 310

Escondido, CA 92025

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Focht, Matthew

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Focht, Jillian

Answer

Answer filed by Focht, Jillian; Focht, Matthew.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Focht, Jillian; Focht, Matthew.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Focht, Jillian; Focht, Matthew. Refers to: Johnson, David; CHAPMAN, KYLE

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Focht, Jillian; Focht, Matthew.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Johnson, David

Answer

Answer filed by Johnson, David Kerry.

Answer

Answer (TO CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by Johnson, David Kerry.

Demurrer

Demurrer (5/5/17) filed by CHAPMAN, KYLE.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.

David Johnson's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Johnson, David Kerry.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Focht, Jillian; Focht, Matthew.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Focht, Matthew; Focht, Jillian.

Complaint Demanding More than 10000 but less than 25000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Johnson, David; Focht, Matthew; Focht, Jillian

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Johnson, David; Focht, Matthew; Focht, Jillian

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Johnson, David; Focht, Matthew; Focht, Jillian

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to CHAPMAN, KYLE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Johnson, David Kerry .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Focht, Jillian .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Focht, Matthew .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Focht, Jillian .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Focht, Matthew .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Johnson, David Kerry .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Focht, Matthew; Focht, Jillian. Filed By: Focht, Matthew (Defendant); Focht, Jillian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/07/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Focht, Matthew Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Johnson, David Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Johnson, David; Focht, Matthew; Focht, Jillian Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/07/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Johnson, David; Focht, Matthew; Focht, Jillian Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Johnson, David; Focht, Matthew; Focht, Jillian Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Johnson, David; Focht, Matthew; Focht, Jillian Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Graves, David William