This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/13/2022 at 08:17:36 (UTC).

Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP vs GROUND CONTROL CONSTRUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GROUND CONTROL CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP

Defendants

Cruz, Marcel Daniel

Ground Control Construction Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Veldkamp, Arnold L

1508 W Mission Rd

Escondido, CA 92029

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Ground Control Construction Inc; Cruz, Marcel

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Ground Control Construction Inc; Cruz, Marcel

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Ground Control Construction Inc; Cruz, Marcel

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Cruz, Marcel Daniel .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Ground Control Construction Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/30/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freeland, Cynthia.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Ground Control Construction Inc; Cruz, Marcel; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Ground Control Construction Inc; Cruz, Marcel; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP. Refers to: Ground Control Construction Inc; Cruz, Marcel; Filed By: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP is a litigant