This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 04:08:55 (UTC).

Sunshine Retirement Living LLC vs Peterson

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 Sunshine Retirement Living LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Peterson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOAN M. LEWIS and Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOAN M. LEWIS

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CANTERBURY COURT INVESTORS LLC

SUNSHINE RETIREMENT LIVING LLC

Defendants

PETERSON, DARCI

PETERSON, DARRYL MAXX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRISON, HALEY

888 Sw Fifth Avenue 1600

Portland, OR 97204

Defendant Attorney

GHARABIKLOU, CAMERON J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CAMERON J GHARABIKLOU

530 B Street Suite 1530

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sunshine Retirement Living LLC; Canterbury Court Investors LLC. Refers to: Peterson, Darryl Maxx; Peterson, Darci

Complaint

Complaint filed by Sunshine Retirement Living LLC; Canterbury Court Investors LLC. Refers to: Peterson, Darryl Maxx; Peterson, Darci

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Canterbury Court Investors LLC; Sunshine Retirement Living LLC. Refers to: Peterson, Darryl Maxx; Peterson, Darci

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order Consolidating cases for all purposes) filed by Canterbury Court Investors LLC; Sunshine Retirement Living LLC; Peterson, Darci; Peterson, Darryl Maxx.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Lewis,Joan to Frazier,Ronald effective 12/29/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Lewis,Joan to Frazier,Ronald effective 12/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order Consolidating cases for all purposes) filed by Canterbury Court Investors LLC; Sunshine Retirement Living LLC; Peterson, Darci; Peterson, Darryl Maxx. Filed By: Canterbury Court Investors LLC (Plaintiff); Sunshine Retirement Living LLC (Plaintiff); Peterson, Darci (Defendant); Peterson, Darryl Maxx (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Cases consolidated on 10/25/2018. 37-2018-00046649-CU-OE-CTL is designated the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/22/2019 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Canterbury Court Investors LLC; Sunshine Retirement Living LLC. Refers to: Peterson, Darryl Maxx; Peterson, Darci Filed By: Canterbury Court Investors LLC (Plaintiff); Sunshine Retirement Living LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/22/2019 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Lewis, Joan.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sunshine Retirement Living LLC; Canterbury Court Investors LLC. Refers to: Peterson, Darryl Maxx; Peterson, Darci Filed By: Sunshine Retirement Living LLC (Plaintiff); Canterbury Court Investors LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Sunshine Retirement Living LLC; Canterbury Court Investors LLC. Refers to: Peterson, Darryl Maxx; Peterson, Darci Filed By: Sunshine Retirement Living LLC (Plaintiff); Canterbury Court Investors LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORRISON, HALEY M