This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 05:18:50 (UTC).

Sundby vs Myers

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Sundby filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Myers. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Keri Katz and Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Keri Katz

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dale Sundby Trustee

7740 Eads Ave

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendants

Andres Salsido Trustee

Benning Management Group 401k Profit Sharing Plan

Cobin, Barbara A

Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA

Fasack Investments LLC

McCarty, Vickie

Myers, Christopher

Myers, Jeffrey

Myers, Kathleen

Rabinoff, Kimberly Gill

Thompson, Dolores

Todd B Cobin Trustee

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by Dale Sundby Trustee.

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Dale Sundby Trustee. Refers to: Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen; Andres Salsido Trustee; Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Fasack Investments LLC; Benning Management Group 401k Profit Sharing Plan; Myers, Christopher; McCarty, Vickie; Todd B Cobin Trustee; Cobin, Barbara; Thompson, Dolores; Rabinoff, Kimberly

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dale Sundby Trustee. Refers to: Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen; Andres Salsido Trustee; Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Fasack Investments LLC; Benning Management Group 401k Profit Sharing Plan; Myers, Christopher; McCarty, Vickie; Todd B Cobin Trustee; Cobin, Barbara; Thompson, Dolores; Rabinoff, Kimberly

Complaint

Complaint filed by Dale Sundby Trustee. Refers to: Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen; Andres Salsido Trustee; Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Fasack Investments LLC; Benning Management Group 401k Profit Sharing Plan; Myers, Christopher; McCarty, Vickie; Todd B Cobin Trustee; Cobin, Barbara; Thompson, Dolores; Rabinoff, Kimberly

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Dale Sundby Trustee.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Dale Sundby Trustee.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Katz, Keri to Kenneth Medel effective 10/01/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Katz, Keri to Kenneth Medel effective 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Dale Sundby Trustee. Filed By: Dale Sundby Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Myers, Jeffrey .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Myers, Kathleen .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Andres Salsido Trustee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Fasack Investments LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Benning Management Group 401k Profit Sharing Plan.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/03/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Dale Sundby Trustee. Filed By: Dale Sundby Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/03/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by Dale Sundby Trustee. Filed By: Dale Sundby Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Dale Sundby Trustee. Refers to: Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen; Andres Salsido Trustee; Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Fasack Investments LLC; Benning Management Group 401k Profit Sharing Plan; Myers, Christopher; McCarty, Vickie; Todd B Cobin Trustee; Cobin, Barbara; Thompson, Dolores; Rabinoff, Kimberly Filed By: Dale Sundby Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dale Sundby Trustee. Refers to: Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen; Andres Salsido Trustee; Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Fasack Investments LLC; Benning Management Group 401k Profit Sharing Plan; Myers, Christopher; McCarty, Vickie; Todd B Cobin Trustee; Cobin, Barbara; Thompson, Dolores; Rabinoff, Kimberly Filed By: Dale Sundby Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Dale Sundby Trustee. Refers to: Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen; Andres Salsido Trustee; Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Fasack Investments LLC; Benning Management Group 401k Profit Sharing Plan; Myers, Christopher; McCarty, Vickie; Todd B Cobin Trustee; Cobin, Barbara; Thompson, Dolores; Rabinoff, Kimberly Filed By: Dale Sundby Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA is a litigant

Latest cases where Benning Management Group 401k Profit Sharing Plan is a litigant