This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 02:58:08 (UTC).

Sundby vs Myers

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Sundby filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Myers. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sundby, Dale

Defendants

Myers, Jeffrey

Myers, Kathleen

Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA

Andres Salsido Trustee

Barbara A Cobin Trustee

Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan

Fasack Investments LLC

Fine, Scot

Marquee Funding Group, Inc.

McCarty, Vickie

Myers, Christopher

Rabinoff, Kimberly Gill

Rabinoff, Larry

Solovy, R.J.

Thompson, Dolores

Todd B Cobin Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Slome, Troy H.

444 S Flower Street 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Order

Order (Court of Appeal Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice of Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Stay or Dismiss

Notice of Ruling filed by Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (as To Tenative Ruling ROA No 52) filed by Sundby, Dale.

of Petition for Writ of Mandate

Notice - Other (of Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed by Sundby, Dale.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/07/2021 09:00:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 63)

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/07/2021 09:00:00 AM. (As Amended)

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/11/2022 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Sundby, Dale.

Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Lift Stay Order

Opposition - Other (to Ex Parte) filed by Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen.

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Sundby, Dale. Refers to: Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan; Myers, Christopher; McCarty, Vickie; Thompson, Dolores; Rabinoff, Kimberly; Marquee Funding Group, Inc.; Fine, Scot; Solovy, R.J.; Rabinoff, Larry; Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen; Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Andres Salsido Trustee; Todd B Cobin Trustee; Barbara A Cobin Trustee; Fasack Investments LLC

Reply to Opposition - Other

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Sundby, Dale.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/11/2021 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Ruling on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Lift Stay

Notice of Ruling filed by Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Sundby, Dale.

Ex Parte Application for Order Setting Hearing on Order Shortening Time re Contempt Against Plaintiff

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen.

Proposed Order Re Application to Set Hearing Date on Order to Show Cause

Proposed Order submitted by Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA; Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen received but not filed on 05/28/2021.

Response

Response (in opposition to defendants ex parte) filed by Sundby, Dale.

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Fasack Investments LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Myers, Christopher .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to McCarty, Vickie .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Thompson, Dolores .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Rabinoff, Kimberly Gill .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Marquee Funding Group, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Fine, Scot .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Solovy, R.J. .

    Read MoreRead Less
136 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Sundby, Dale. Refers to: Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA Filed By: Sundby, Dale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Sundby, Dale. Refers to: Myers, Jeffrey Filed By: Sundby, Dale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Sundby, Dale. Refers to: Myers, Kathleen Filed By: Sundby, Dale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Sundby, Dale. Filed By: Sundby, Dale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/09/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sundby, Dale. Refers to: Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen; Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA Filed By: Sundby, Dale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sundby, Dale. Refers to: Myers, Jeffrey; Myers, Kathleen; Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA Filed By: Sundby, Dale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA is a litigant

Latest cases where Fasack Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BARBARA A BENTLEY AS GENERAL PARTNER OF THE SACHAR FAMILY PARTNERSHIP LP is a litigant