This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 07:05:06 (UTC).

Sunbelt Rentals Inc vs P & L Consultants & Contractors Inc

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 Sunbelt Rentals Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against P L Consultants Contractors Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunbelt Rentals Inc

Defendants

1037 4th Avenue LLC

BMC WEST LLC

Davis, David Lee

FS3 Capital LLC

P & L Consultants & Contractors Inc

Robertson's Ready Mix LTD

San Diego Housing Commission

Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP

White Cap LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alfaro, Mario H.

Attorney at STREAM KIM HICKS WRAGE & ALFARO PC

3403 Tenth Street 700

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant Attorneys

Goodman, Brett B

Attorney at GOODMAN LAW FIRM APC

11440 W Bernardo Ct Ste 300

San Diego, CA 92127

Townsend, Michael S.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL S TOWNSEND

3952 D Clairemont Mesa Boulevard 456

San Diego, CA 92117

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default as to FS3 Capital, LLC.

Request for Entry of Default filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: FS3 Capital LLC

Answer

Answer filed by Robertson's Ready Mix LTD.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP

Answer of White Cap, L.P.

Answer filed by White Cap LP.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: BMC WEST LLC

Proof of Service by Mail for Notice of Errata

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: San Diego Housing Commission

Proof of Service by Mail for Notice of Errata

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: FS3 Capital LLC

Proof of Service by Mail for Notice of Errata

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: 1037 4th Avenue LLC

Proof of Service by Mail for Notice of Errata

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: White Cap LP

Proof of Service by Mail for Notice of Errata

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: Robertson's Ready Mix LTD

Notice of Errata regarding Complaint

Notice of Errata filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: FS3 Capital LLC; Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Robertson's Ready Mix LTD.; Filed By: Robertson's Ready Mix LTD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP; Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: BMC WEST LLC; Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by White Cap LP.; Filed By: White Cap LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc.; Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: San Diego Housing Commission; Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc.; Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc.; Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: Robertson's Ready Mix LTD; Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc.; Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: P & L Consultants & Contractors Inc; Davis, David; 1037 4th Avenue LLC; San Diego Housing Commission; Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP; White Cap LP; BMC WEST LLC; Robertson's Ready Mix LTD; FS3 Capital LLC; Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: P & L Consultants & Contractors Inc; Davis, David; 1037 4th Avenue LLC; San Diego Housing Commission; Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP; White Cap LP; BMC WEST LLC; Robertson's Ready Mix LTD; FS3 Capital LLC; Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Refers to: P & L Consultants & Contractors Inc; Davis, David; 1037 4th Avenue LLC; San Diego Housing Commission; Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP; White Cap LP; BMC WEST LLC; Robertson's Ready Mix LTD; FS3 Capital LLC; Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITE CAP L.P. A FLORIDA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDBA HD SUPPLY CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where San Diego Housing Commission is a litigant

Latest cases where 1037 4th Avenue LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Ready Mix Concrete LP is a litigant