This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/24/2020 at 01:54:44 (UTC).

Summer Creek 640 LP vs Del Carmen Matarese

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Summer Creek 640 LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Del Carmen Matarese. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUMMER CREEK 640 LP

Defendant

Del Carmen Matarese, Maria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Di Blasi, Chanel

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP.

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP.

Proof of service by Posting(UD)

Proof of service by Posting(UD) filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP received but not filed on 01/14/2020.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Entered, Including Unknowns) filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknowns) filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria

Declaration of Due Diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria

Order Allowing Service of Summons by Posting and Mailing

Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (ORDER SIGNED 12-20-19) filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment (& Supporting Declarations) filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Filed By: SUMMER CREEK 640 LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Filed By: SUMMER CREEK 640 LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknowns) filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria Filed By: SUMMER CREEK 640 LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketJudgment rendered for SUMMER CREEK 640 LP and against Del Carmen Matarese, Maria for a grand total of 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for SUMMER CREEK 640 LP and against Del Carmen Matarese, Maria for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Entered, Including Unknowns) filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria Filed By: SUMMER CREEK 640 LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP received but not filed on 01/14/2020. Filed By: SUMMER CREEK 640 LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service by Posting(UD) filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria Filed By: SUMMER CREEK 640 LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Filed By: SUMMER CREEK 640 LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Del Carmen Matarese, Maria on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (ORDER SIGNED 12-20-19) filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria Filed By: SUMMER CREEK 640 LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria Filed By: SUMMER CREEK 640 LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria Filed By: SUMMER CREEK 640 LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria Filed By: SUMMER CREEK 640 LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by SUMMER CREEK 640 LP. Refers to: Del Carmen Matarese, Maria Filed By: SUMMER CREEK 640 LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Summer Creek 640 LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Di Blasi, Chanel