This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 07:11:57 (UTC).

Sullivan vs Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 Sullivan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sullivan, Sean

Defendants

Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC; DBA : Drivetime

Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARR, ROBERT L

23901 Calabasas Road 2072

Calabasas, CA 91302

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Sullivan, Sean. Refers to: Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sullivan, Sean. Refers to: Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Sullivan, Sean. Refers to: Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration Re:Venue) filed by Sullivan, Sean. Refers to: Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sullivan, Sean. Refers to: Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sullivan, Sean. Refers to: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/07/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Status Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/07/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/21/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sullivan, Sean. Refers to: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland; Filed By: Sullivan, Sean (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sullivan, Sean. Refers to: Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC; Filed By: Sullivan, Sean (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/21/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration Re:Venue) filed by Sullivan, Sean. Refers to: Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland; Filed By: Sullivan, Sean (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Sullivan, Sean. Refers to: Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland; Filed By: Sullivan, Sean (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sullivan, Sean. Refers to: Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland; Filed By: Sullivan, Sean (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sullivan, Sean. Refers to: Drivetime Car Sales Company LLC; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland; Filed By: Sullivan, Sean (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STARR ROBERT LORNE