This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 04:52:44 (UTC).

Storm vs Snap-On Incorporated

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Storm filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Snap-On Incorporated. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Storm, Logan

Defendants

Snap-On Incorporated; DBA : Mitchell 1

Mitchell Repair Information LLC; DBA : Mitchell 1

Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC; DBA : Mitchell 1;ESA : Mitchell Repair Information LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Friedman, Todd M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TODD M FRIEDMAN PC

Grumet, Elizabeth

Attorney at THE GRUMET GONZALEZ LAW FIRM

Defendant Attorney

Kaufman, Thomas R

Attorney at SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Storm, Logan. Refers to: Snap-On Incorporated; Mitchell Repair Information LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Storm, Logan. Refers to: Snap-On Incorporated; Mitchell Repair Information LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Storm, Logan. Refers to: Snap-On Incorporated; Mitchell Repair Information LLC

DEFENDANT MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPAINT

Answer filed by Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 01/08/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-69 before Katherine Bacal at Central.

Request for Dismissal (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal filed by Storm, Logan.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/07/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Substitution of Attorney (Participant Information)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Storm, Logan.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 01/07/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-69 before Katherine Bacal at Central.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Snap-On Incorporated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Storm, Logan .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Storm, Logan. Filed By: Storm, Logan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/07/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Storm, Logan. Filed By: Storm, Logan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 01/07/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-69 before Katherine Bacal at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/07/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 01/08/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-69 before Katherine Bacal at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC. Filed By: Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Storm, Logan. Refers to: Snap-On Incorporated; Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC Filed By: Storm, Logan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Storm, Logan. Refers to: Snap-On Incorporated; Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC Filed By: Storm, Logan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Storm, Logan. Refers to: Snap-On Incorporated; Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC Filed By: Storm, Logan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SNAP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAUFMAN THOMAS ROY