This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/25/2020 at 02:08:44 (UTC).

Stika vs. County of San Diego

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Stika filed an Other lawsuit against County of San Diego. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Stika, Matt

Respondents

Board of Supervisors of the County of San Diego

McCauley, Kevin

County of San Diego

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (DENIED) filed by Stika, Matt.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/12/2020.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stika, Matt. Refers to: County of San Diego; Board of Supervisors of the County of San Diego; McCauley, Kevin

Petition - Other

Petition - Other (Petition for Order Relieving Petitioner from Provisions of Government Code) filed by Stika, Matt. Refers to: County of San Diego; Board of Supervisors of the County of San Diego; McCauley, Kevin

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • Hearing on Petition scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/12/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (DENIED) filed by Stika, Matt. Filed By: Stika, Matt (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - Other (Petition for Order Relieving Petitioner from Provisions of Government Code) filed by Stika, Matt. Refers to: County of San Diego; Board of Supervisors of the County of San Diego; McCauley, Kevin Filed By: Stika, Matt (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stika, Matt. Refers to: County of San Diego; Board of Supervisors of the County of San Diego; McCauley, Kevin Filed By: Stika, Matt (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Stika, Matt. Filed By: Stika, Matt (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Case assigned to Department 903.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.