Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/12/2021 at 07:24:30 (UTC).

Stewart vs United Parcel Service Inc

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Stewart filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against United Parcel Service Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory W Pollack and Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gregory W Pollack

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEWART, GARY

Defendant

United Parcel Service Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pancer, Ian

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF IAN PANCER

Defendant Attorney

Owen, Kaitlin H

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Pollack, Gregory W to Keri Katz effective 05/20/2021

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF GARY STEWARTS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Answer filed by United Parcel Service Inc.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Peremptory Challenge filed by United Parcel Service Inc.

PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service filed by United Parcel Service Inc.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by STEWART, GARY. Refers to: United Parcel Service Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by STEWART, GARY. Refers to: United Parcel Service Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by STEWART, GARY. Refers to: United Parcel Service Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Pollack, Gregory W to Keri Katz effective 05/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by United Parcel Service Inc. Filed By: United Parcel Service Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by United Parcel Service Inc. Filed By: United Parcel Service Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by United Parcel Service Inc. Filed By: United Parcel Service Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by STEWART, GARY. Refers to: United Parcel Service Inc Filed By: STEWART, GARY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by STEWART, GARY. Refers to: United Parcel Service Inc Filed By: STEWART, GARY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by STEWART, GARY. Refers to: United Parcel Service Inc Filed By: STEWART, GARY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Parcel Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OWEN KAITLIN HANIGAN