This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/26/2022 at 07:01:09 (UTC).

Stevenson vs. Contreras

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 Stevenson filed an Other lawsuit against Contreras. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Stevenson, Jenny

Fallbrook, CA 92028

Respondent

Contreras, Alyssa Lerann Kroll

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-03; Event Type: Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse - Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Stevenson, Jenny. Refers to: Contreras, Alyssa; Filed By: Stevenson, Jenny (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse heard 11/07/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse continued pursuant to stipulation to 11/28/2022 at 01:30PM in Department N-03.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse heard 10/20/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse continued pursuant to party's motion to 11/07/2022 at 08:30AM in Department N-03.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Stevenson, Jenny. Refers to: Contreras, Alyssa; Filed By: Stevenson, Jenny (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR COURT COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Stevenson, Jenny. Refers to: Contreras, Alyssa; Filed By: Stevenson, Jenny (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Stevenson, Jenny. Refers to: Contreras, Alyssa; Filed By: Stevenson, Jenny (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (GRANTED) filed by Stevenson, Jenny. Refers to: Contreras, Alyssa; Filed By: Stevenson, Jenny (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Other (for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes) filed by Stevenson, Jenny.; Filed By: Stevenson, Jenny (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-03.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stevenson, Jenny. Refers to: Contreras, Alyssa; Filed By: Stevenson, Jenny (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention) filed by Stevenson, Jenny. Refers to: Contreras, Alyssa; Filed By: Stevenson, Jenny (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less