This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 01:02:42 (UTC).

Sterling Jewelers Inc vs. Galoski

Case Summary

On 04/10/2012 Sterling Jewelers Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Galoski. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sterling Jewelers Inc; DBA : Kay Jewelers

Defendants

Galoski, Brittany M; AKA : Galoski, Brittany

Kinney, Justin M; AKA : Kinney, Justin

Assignee

DNF Associates LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zeller, Stephen S

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP APC

110 East Wilshire Avenue 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

Assignee Attorney

Cara, Grace Gail

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP APC

110 East Wilshire Avenue 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany; Kinney, Justin

Assignment of Judgment

Assignment of Judgment filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: DNF Associates LLC

Satisfaction of Judgment - Partial

Satisfaction of Judgment - Partial filed by DNF Associates LLC. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany; Kinney, Justin

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany; Kinney, Justin

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany; Kinney, Justin

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Kinney, Justin

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany; Kinney, Justin

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (For Judgement and Declaration) filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc.

Abstract of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution issued.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - Partial filed by DNF Associates LLC. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany Filed By: DNF Associates LLC (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (New Attorney) filed by DNF Associates LLC. Filed By: DNF Associates LLC (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Assignment of Judgment filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: DNF Associates LLC Filed By: Sterling Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany; Kinney, Justin Filed By: Sterling Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany; Kinney, Justin Filed By: Sterling Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Filed By: Sterling Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany; Kinney, Justin Filed By: Sterling Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2012
  • **COURT DEFAULT AND/OR JUDGMENT PACKET REC'D**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany Filed By: Sterling Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Kinney, Justin Filed By: Sterling Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Filed By: Sterling Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Filed By: Sterling Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany; Kinney, Justin Filed By: Sterling Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Galoski, Brittany; Kinney, Justin Filed By: DNF Associates LLC (Assignee); Sterling Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.