This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 04:33:48 (UTC).

Steinbeck vs Chen

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 Steinbeck filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Chen. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Randa Trapp. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Randa Trapp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steinbeck, Steven

Defendants

A+ Dental Corporation; DBA : A+ Dental Office of Dr Christy Chen

Chen, Christy Yan-Ching

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gallagher, Sarah

Attorney at THE LARABEE LAW FIRM

8910 University Center Lane Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92122

Larabee, Joel D

Attorney at THE LARABEE LAW FIRM

8910 University Center Lane Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92122

Defendant Attorneys

Whitman, Charles F

Graves, David William

Attorney at LATURNO & GRAVES

822 Strawberry Glen

Escondido, CA 92025

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by A+ Dental Corporation; Chen, Christy Yan-Ching.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by A+ Dental Corporation; Chen, Christy Yan-Ching.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney (A+ Dental Corporation) filed by A+ Dental Corporation.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney (Christy Yan-Ching Chen) filed by Chen, Christy Yan-Ching.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Steinbeck, Steven.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Steinbeck, Steven.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 01/22/2021 at 10:10:00 AM in C-70 before Randa Trapp at Central.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal Chen

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Steinbeck, Steven. Refers to: Chen, Christy

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal A+

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Steinbeck, Steven; Steinbeck, Steven. Refers to: A+ Dental Corporation

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by A+ Dental Corporation; Chen, Christy Yan-Ching.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by A+ Dental Corporation; Chen, Christy Yan-Ching.

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Steinbeck, Steven. Refers to: Chen, Christy; A+ Dental Corporation

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Steinbeck, Steven. Refers to: Chen, Christy; A+ Dental Corporation

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Chen, Christy Yan-Ching .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to A+ Dental Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Steinbeck, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Steinbeck, Steven. Filed By: Steinbeck, Steven (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Steinbeck, Steven. Filed By: Steinbeck, Steven (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/22/2021 at 10:10:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMotion to Quash (Civil) scheduled for 10/23/2020 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by A+ Dental Corporation; Chen, Christy Yan-Ching. Filed By: A+ Dental Corporation (Defendant); Chen, Christy Yan-Ching (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/18/2020 at 10:10:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Steinbeck, Steven. Refers to: Chen, Christy; A+ Dental Corporation Filed By: Steinbeck, Steven (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Steinbeck, Steven. Refers to: Chen, Christy; A+ Dental Corporation Filed By: Steinbeck, Steven (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Steinbeck, Steven. Refers to: Chen, Christy; A+ Dental Corporation Filed By: Steinbeck, Steven (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A+ Dental Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larabee, Joel D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALLAGHER SARAH ELIZABETH