Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 08:38:18 (UTC).

STEELER INC vs APSGC INC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 STEELER INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against APSGC INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

STEELER INC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

APSGC Inc

Accetta, Jamie Robert

2707 Boston Avenue SD LLC

The Western Surety Company

STEELER INC

Go-Staff Inc

American Asphalt & Concrete Inc

Cross Plaintiff

Western Surety Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Apanian, Milene C

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PAGAN, JOHN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service-APSGC

Proof of Service filed by Western Surety Company.

Proof of Service-Go Staff

Proof of Service filed by Western Surety Company.

Proof of Service-American Asphalt

Proof of Service filed by Western Surety Company.

General Denial

General Denial filed by Western Surety Company.

Original Summons

Original Summons (Cross Complaint) filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: APSGC Inc; STEELER INC; American Asphalt & Concrete Inc; Go-Staff Inc

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: American Asphalt & Concrete Inc; Go-Staff Inc; APSGC Inc; STEELER INC

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by STEELER INC. Refers to: APSGC Inc; Accetta, Jamie; 2707 Boston Avenue SD LLC; The Western Surety Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by STEELER INC. Refers to: APSGC Inc; Accetta, Jamie; 2707 Boston Avenue SD LLC; The Western Surety Company

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by STEELER INC. Refers to: APSGC Inc; Accetta, Jamie; 2707 Boston Avenue SD LLC; The Western Surety Company

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Western Surety Company. Filed By: Western Surety Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Western Surety Company. Filed By: Western Surety Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Western Surety Company. Filed By: Western Surety Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial filed by Western Surety Company. Filed By: Western Surety Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons (Cross Complaint) filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: APSGC Inc; STEELER INC; American Asphalt & Concrete Inc; Go-Staff Inc Filed By: Western Surety Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: American Asphalt & Concrete Inc; Go-Staff Inc; APSGC Inc; STEELER INC Filed By: Western Surety Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by STEELER INC. Refers to: APSGC Inc; Accetta, Jamie; 2707 Boston Avenue SD LLC; The Western Surety Company Filed By: STEELER INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by STEELER INC. Refers to: APSGC Inc; Accetta, Jamie; 2707 Boston Avenue SD LLC; The Western Surety Company Filed By: STEELER INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by STEELER INC. Refers to: APSGC Inc; Accetta, Jamie; 2707 Boston Avenue SD LLC; The Western Surety Company Filed By: STEELER INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Go Staff Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN ASPHALT AND CONCRETE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Steeler Inc Drywall Construction Supply is a litigant

Latest cases where 2707 Boston Avenue SD LLC is a litigant