This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 06:53:07 (UTC).

Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc vs Theodore L Vallas

Case Summary

On 01/26/2015 Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Theodore L Vallas. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc; DBA : SCS Engineers

Defendant

Vallas, Theodore L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Liedle, Matthew J

Attorney at LIEDLE LARSON LIDL & VAIL LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive 200

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

Notice of Conditional Settlement

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice of Trial Date

Notice - Other (Notice of Trial Date) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/10/2015 08:30:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Answer (with summons and declaration) submitted by Vallas, Theodore L rejected on 03/31/2015.

Denied Request for entry of default

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore

Complaint

Complaint filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Vallas, Theodore L .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Court Trial scheduled for 12/11/2015 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketCivil Court Trial scheduled for 12/11/2015 at 01:30PM before Judge Joel M. Pressman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/10/2015 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Trial Date) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/10/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: Vallas, Theodore Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pressman, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less