This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 13:19:30 (UTC).

Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc vs BioFuels Point Loma LLC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2015 Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BioFuels Point Loma LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH F. HAYES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH F. HAYES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc; DBA : SCS Energy

Defendant

BioFuels Point Loma LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ward, Garth N

 

Court Documents

Notice of Conditional Settlement

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: BioFuels Point Loma LLC

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: BioFuels Point Loma LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: BioFuels Point Loma LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: BioFuels Point Loma LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: BioFuels Point Loma LLC

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

Request for Dismissal as to BioFuels Point Loma, LLC

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: BioFuels Point Loma LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: BioFuels Point Loma LLC Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to BioFuels Point Loma LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: BioFuels Point Loma LLC Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/04/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: BioFuels Point Loma LLC Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/04/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Hayes, Judith.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: BioFuels Point Loma LLC Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: BioFuels Point Loma LLC Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: BioFuels Point Loma LLC Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less