This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 07:15:45 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs Harker

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Harker. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew C. Braner and Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Matthew C. Braner

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendant

Harker, Warren Timothy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahfouz II, Richard L.

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Harker, Warren

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Harker, Warren

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Harker, Warren

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 07/08/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-60 before Matthew C. Braner at Central.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Medel,Kenneth to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Braner, Matthew for 06/17/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in C-60 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Medel,Kenneth to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 07/08/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-60 before Matthew C. Braner at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Harker, Warren Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Harker, Warren Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Harker, Warren Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.