This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/09/2018 at 09:15:45 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs. Faye Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 11/05/2010 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Faye Rodriguez. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, FAYE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ II, RICHARD L

Attorney at CLERKIN SINCLAIR & MAHFOUZ LLP

530 B Street 8Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

GREBING, CHARLES R

Attorney at WINGERT GREBING BRUBAKER & JUSKIE LLP

1200 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/29/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/29/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/26/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 10/26/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 12/01/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 12/01/2011 08:30:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 30)

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 12/01/2011 08:30:00 AM. (As Amended)

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 04/09/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2012
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 04/09/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Rodriguez, Faye. Filed By: Rodriguez, Faye (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 04/09/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement (Notice of Settlement of Entire Case. A request for dismissal will be filed no later than 4/1/2017) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Rodriguez, Faye Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/16/2012 at 10:00:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • Expedited Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2012
  • Expedited Jury Trial reassigned to Medel, Kenneth for 04/05/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in S-07 at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2012
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) reassigned to Medel, Kenneth for 03/16/2012 at 10:00:00 AM in S-07 at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/29/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Rodriguez, Faye. Filed By: Rodriguez, Faye (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • Answer filed by Rodriguez, Faye. Filed By: Rodriguez, Faye (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Rodriguez, Faye Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • Certificate of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Rodriguez, Faye Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Original Summons filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.