Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 04:01:06 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs Elzen

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Elzen. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Randa Trapp and Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Randa Trapp

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants

Elzen, Arnoldus Den

Caterpillar Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pleasant, Joseph M

Attorney at REESE LAW GROUP

Defendant Attorney

Parks, Colton F.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020

Defendant Arnoldus Den Elzen Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial

Answer filed by Elzen, Arnoldus Den. Refers to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial

Answer filed by Caterpillar Inc. Refers to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Elzen, Arnoldus; Caterpillar Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Elzen, Arnoldus; Caterpillar Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Elzen, Arnoldus; Caterpillar Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Caietti, Carolyn for 04/16/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-70 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Elzen, Arnoldus Den. Refers to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Filed By: Elzen, Arnoldus Den (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Caterpillar Inc. Refers to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Filed By: Caterpillar Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Elzen, Arnoldus; Caterpillar Inc Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Elzen, Arnoldus; Caterpillar Inc Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Elzen, Arnoldus; Caterpillar Inc Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Caterpillar, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARLAN M. REESE & ASSOCIATES - JOSEPH M. PLEASANT