Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 01:57:48 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs Costco Wholesale Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Costco Wholesale Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants

Costco Wholesale Corporation

Penske Truck Leasing Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahfouz II, Richard L.

Attorney at CLERKIN SINCLAIR & MAHFOUZ LLP

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Costco Wholesale Corporation; Penske Truck Leasing Corporation

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Costco Wholesale Corporation; Penske Truck Leasing Corporation

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Costco Wholesale Corporation; Penske Truck Leasing Corporation

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Costco Wholesale Corporation; Penske Truck Leasing Corporation Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Costco Wholesale Corporation; Penske Truck Leasing Corporation Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Costco Wholesale Corporation; Penske Truck Leasing Corporation Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.