This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 07:23:54 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INS CO vs GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 STATE FARM GENERAL INS CO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm General Ins Co

Defendant

GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLEASANT, JOSEPH M

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other filed by State Farm General Ins Co. Refers to: GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by State Farm General Ins Co. Refers to: GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm General Ins Co. Refers to: GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by State Farm General Ins Co. Refers to: GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION

Declaration of Due Diligence (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by State Farm General Ins Co. Refers to: GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by State Farm General Ins Co. Refers to: GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION Filed By: State Farm General Ins Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/25/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by State Farm General Ins Co. Refers to: GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION Filed By: State Farm General Ins Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm General Ins Co. Refers to: GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION Filed By: State Farm General Ins Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by State Farm General Ins Co. Refers to: GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION Filed By: State Farm General Ins Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by State Farm General Ins Co. Refers to: GOLDEN PACIFIC RESTORATION Filed By: State Farm General Ins Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARLAN M. REESE & ASSOCIATES - JOSEPH M. PLEASANT