This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 01:32:59 (UTC).

Stadille-James vs Colby DMD

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 Stadille-James filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Colby DMD. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Mangione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stadille-James, Lynn

Defendants

COLBY DENTAL CORPORATION

Colby DMD, Jordan D

JORDAN D COLBY DMD INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Simowitz, Mark B

591 Camino De La Reina Ste 525

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stadille-James, Lynn. Refers to: Colby DMD, Jordan; JORDAN D COLBY DMD INC; COLBY DENTAL CORPORATION

Complaint

Complaint filed by Stadille-James, Lynn. Refers to: Colby DMD, Jordan; JORDAN D COLBY DMD INC; COLBY DENTAL CORPORATION

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/09/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Mangione, James.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stadille-James, Lynn. Refers to: Colby DMD, Jordan; JORDAN D COLBY DMD INC; COLBY DENTAL CORPORATION; Filed By: Stadille-James, Lynn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Stadille-James, Lynn. Refers to: Colby DMD, Jordan; JORDAN D COLBY DMD INC; COLBY DENTAL CORPORATION; Filed By: Stadille-James, Lynn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMOWITZ MARK