This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/12/2020 at 12:03:46 (UTC).

Staab vs SDHI Inc

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Staab filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SDHI Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Staab, Martha

Defendants

SDHI Inc

Crocker, John R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geyman, Douglas E

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DOUGLAS E GEYMAN

Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS, YVETTE

Obra-White, Bethsaida C

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Staab, Martha. Refers to: SDHI Inc; Crocker, John

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Staab, Martha. Refers to: SDHI Inc; Crocker, John

Complaint

Complaint filed by Staab, Martha. Refers to: SDHI Inc; Crocker, John

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Staab, Martha. Refers to: SDHI Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Staab, Martha. Refers to: SDHI Inc

Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Crocker, John R; SDHI Inc.

Defendants SDHI, Inc. and John R. Crocker's Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Crocker, John R; SDHI Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Crocker, John R; SDHI Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Crocker, John R; SDHI Inc.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 07/31/2020 at 11:15:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/31/2020 11:15:00 AM.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Staab, Martha.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Staab, Martha.

Defendants SDHI, Inc. and John R. Crocker's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Crocker, John R; SDHI Inc.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 24 months.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 09:45AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/16/2021 at 10:00AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketJury demanded by plaintiff.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/31/2020 11:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Staab, Martha. Filed By: Staab, Martha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Staab, Martha. Filed By: Staab, Martha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Crocker, John R; SDHI Inc. Filed By: Crocker, John R (Defendant); SDHI Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Crocker, John R; SDHI Inc. Filed By: Crocker, John R (Defendant); SDHI Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Crocker, John R; SDHI Inc. Filed By: Crocker, John R (Defendant); SDHI Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Staab, Martha. Refers to: SDHI Inc Filed By: Staab, Martha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Staab, Martha. Refers to: SDHI Inc Filed By: Staab, Martha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Staab, Martha. Refers to: SDHI Inc; Crocker, John Filed By: Staab, Martha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Staab, Martha. Refers to: SDHI Inc; Crocker, John Filed By: Staab, Martha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Staab, Martha. Refers to: SDHI Inc; Crocker, John Filed By: Staab, Martha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2020 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBRA-WHITE BETHSAIDA CORREA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS YVETTE