This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 09:23:02 (UTC).

Springleaf Financial Services Inc vs. Bennett

Case Summary

On 06/01/2012 Springleaf Financial Services Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bennett. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Springleaf Financial Services Inc

Defendant

Bennett, Nancy J; AKA : Bennett, Nancy Jo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steingisser, I Robert

PARIS, JEFFREY A

Attorney at PARIS AND PARIS LLP

1625 17Th St

Santa Monica, CA 90404

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Bennett, Nancy

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Bennett, Nancy

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Bennett, Nancy

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Bennett, Nancy

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Bennett, Nancy

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does (Does 1-20) filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc.

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Bennett, Nancy

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Bennett, Nancy

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Bennett, Nancy

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc.

Abstract of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc.

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Filed By: Springleaf Financial Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Filed By: Springleaf Financial Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • *****Writ Received*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • ****ABSTRACT RECEIVED****.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Filed By: Springleaf Financial Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Springleaf Financial Services Inc and against Bennett, Nancy J for $ 2672.70, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 313.11, prejudgment costs: $ 270.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 3255.81.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Bennett, Nancy Filed By: Springleaf Financial Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Default entered as to Bennett, Nancy J on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does (Does 1-20) filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc. Filed By: Springleaf Financial Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • **COURT default/judgment rec'd**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Springleaf Financial Services Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less