This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 03:57:33 (UTC).

Southern Indian Health Council vs Joles

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Southern Indian Health Council filed an Other lawsuit against Joles. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Southern Indian Health Council

Respondent

Joles, Jeremiah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Salayer, Tiffany

Attorney at PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-61; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 04/20/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/24/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Southern Indian Health Council. Filed By: Southern Indian Health Council (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 03/24/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/10/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Southern Indian Health Council. Filed By: Southern Indian Health Council (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders filed by Southern Indian Health Council. Refers to: CASWELL, LAURA; Le, Kelly; All SIHC Employees; Joles, Jeremiah Filed By: Southern Indian Health Council (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Southern Indian Health Council. Refers to: CASWELL, LAURA; Le, Kelly; All SIHC Employees; Joles, Jeremiah Filed By: Southern Indian Health Council (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Southern Indian Health Council. Filed By: Southern Indian Health Council (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketWorkplace Violence Restraining Order After Hearing filed by Southern Indian Health Council. Filed By: Southern Indian Health Council (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/10/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.