This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 07:23:52 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY VS DURA LINE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DURA LINE CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Southern California Gas Company

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CM Distributors Inc

Dura Line Corporation

Cross Defendant and Defendant

Dura Line Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brecht, Celeste M

McMillan, Daniel D

Mizel, Annika B.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Lidl, Erich J.

Attorney at THOMAS LUCAS

Lucas, Timothy D

Erickson, Mark David

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Erickson, Mark David

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint (First Papers)

Cross-Complaint filed by CM Distributors Inc. Refers to: Dura Line Corporation

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other filed by CM Distributors Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Original Summons (to Cross Complaint) filed by CM Distributors Inc. Refers to: Dura Line Corporation

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by CM Distributors Inc.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by CM Distributors Inc.

Motion - Other (Motions)

Motion - Other (to transfer venue) filed by Dura Line Corporation.

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Counter) filed by Dura Line Corporation.

Proposed Order (Motions)

Proposed Order submitted by Dura Line Corporation received but not filed on 11/22/2021.

Request for Judicial Notice (Requests)

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Dura Line Corporation.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (of Mark D. Erickson) filed by Dura Line Corporation.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Southern California Gas Company. Refers to: CM Distributors Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Southern California Gas Company. Refers to: Dura Line Corporation

Complaint

Complaint filed by Southern California Gas Company; San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dura Line Corporation; CM Distributors Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Southern California Gas Company; San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dura Line Corporation; CM Distributors Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Southern California Gas Company; San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dura Line Corporation; CM Distributors Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Other (to transfer venue) filed by Dura Line Corporation. Filed By: Dura Line Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Counter) filed by Dura Line Corporation. Filed By: Dura Line Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Dura Line Corporation received but not filed on 11/22/2021. Filed By: Dura Line Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice filed by Dura Line Corporation. Filed By: Dura Line Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Mark D. Erickson) filed by Dura Line Corporation. Filed By: Dura Line Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by CM Distributors Inc. Refers to: Dura Line Corporation Filed By: CM Distributors Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by CM Distributors Inc. Filed By: CM Distributors Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Southern California Gas Company. Refers to: CM Distributors Inc Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff); Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Southern California Gas Company. Refers to: Dura Line Corporation Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff); Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/15/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Southern California Gas Company; San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dura Line Corporation; CM Distributors Inc Filed By: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Southern California Gas Company; San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dura Line Corporation; CM Distributors Inc Filed By: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Southern California Gas Company; San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dura Line Corporation; CM Distributors Inc Filed By: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCMILLAN DANIEL DELOS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRECHT CELESTE MARIE