This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 04:01:40 (UTC).

Soussan Ayari vs. TL Scanian Constructions Inc

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Soussan Ayari filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TL Scanian Constructions Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ziai, Babak

Ayari, Soussan

Defendants

Scanlan, Kristina Louise

TL Scanian Constructions Inc

TL Scanlan Constructions Inc

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Ayari, Soussan; Ziai, Babak. Refers to: TL Scanian Constructions Inc; Scanlan, Kristina

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-63; Event Type: Small Claims Court Trial - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal (Trail; Lodgments) filed by Ayari, Soussan. Refers to: TL Scanlan Constructions Inc Filed By: Ayari, Soussan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Thomas Lud Scanlan; Lodgmnts A-C) filed by Ayari, Soussan. Filed By: Ayari, Soussan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (Lodgments A-C) filed by Ayari, Soussan. Refers to: Scanlan, Kristina Filed By: Ayari, Soussan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 06/04/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Ayari, Soussan; Ziai, Babak. Refers to: TL Scanlan Constructions Inc; Scanlan, Kristina Filed By: Ayari, Soussan (Plaintiff); Ziai, Babak (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less