Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 03:41:24 (UTC).

SOLIS vs UNWALA

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 SOLIS filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against UNWALA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI

Respondent

UNWALA, MURTAZA ABBAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed WITHOUT prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/06/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (On Request To Continue Hearing) filed by SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI. Filed By: SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPetitioner's request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 03/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/31/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition (DEFECTIVE) filed by SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI. Refers to: UNWALA, MURTAZA Filed By: SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI. Refers to: UNWALA, MURTAZA Filed By: SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue Court Hearing filed by SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI. Filed By: SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI. Refers to: UNWALA, MURTAZA Filed By: SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Response By Mail (RE: RESPONSE) filed by UNWALA, MURTAZA ABBAS. Refers to: SOLIS, DEBORAH Filed By: UNWALA, MURTAZA ABBAS (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order reassigned to for 01/03/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in N-03 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned from N-02 to N-03 effective 12/22/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI. Refers to: UNWALA, MURTAZA Filed By: SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI. Refers to: UNWALA, MURTAZA Filed By: SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI. Refers to: UNWALA, MURTAZA Filed By: SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI. Refers to: UNWALA, MURTAZA Filed By: SOLIS, DEBORAH ELI (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 01/03/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-02 .

    Read MoreRead Less