Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 07:13:49 (UTC).

Smith vs Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Smith filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Volkswagen Group of America Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smith, Jordan

Defendants

Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Doe 1 Bonding Agent

GPI CA-SV Inc; DBA : Volkswagen of Kearny Mesa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hirsh, Amy

Defendant Attorney

Makinde, Hannah

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by Volkswagen Group of America Inc; GPI CA-SV Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Smith, Jordan. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Smith, Jordan. Refers to: GPI CA-SV Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Smith, Jordan. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; GPI CA-SV Inc; Doe 1 Bonding Agent

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Smith, Jordan. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; GPI CA-SV Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Smith, Jordan. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; GPI CA-SV Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Meet and Confer filed by Volkswagen Group of America Inc; GPI CA-SV Inc. Filed By: Volkswagen Group of America Inc (Defendant); GPI CA-SV Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Smith, Jordan. Refers to: GPI CA-SV Inc Filed By: Smith, Jordan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Smith, Jordan. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc Filed By: Smith, Jordan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Smith, Jordan. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; GPI CA-SV Inc; Doe 1 Bonding Agent Filed By: Smith, Jordan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Smith, Jordan. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; GPI CA-SV Inc Filed By: Smith, Jordan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Smith, Jordan. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; GPI CA-SV Inc Filed By: Smith, Jordan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hirsh, Amy