This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 04:21:01 (UTC).

Smart Women's Choice Inc VS Fill It Pack It Inc

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Smart Women's Choice Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fill It Pack It Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald L. Styn. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald L. Styn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smart Women's Choice Inc

Defendant

Fill It Pack It Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dillon, Timothy P

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Smart Women's Choice Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Smart Women's Choice Inc. Refers to: Fill It Pack It Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Smart Women's Choice Inc. Refers to: Fill It Pack It Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Smart Women's Choice Inc. Refers to: Fill It Pack It Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Smart Women's Choice Inc. Refers to: Fill It Pack It Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Fill It Pack It Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Smart Women's Choice Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Smart Women's Choice Inc. Filed By: Smart Women's Choice Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Smart Women's Choice Inc. Refers to: Fill It Pack It Inc Filed By: Smart Women's Choice Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Smart Women's Choice Inc. Refers to: Fill It Pack It Inc Filed By: Smart Women's Choice Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Smart Women's Choice Inc. Refers to: Fill It Pack It Inc Filed By: Smart Women's Choice Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Smart Women's Choice Inc. Refers to: Fill It Pack It Inc Filed By: Smart Women's Choice Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DILLON TIMOTHY