This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/02/2018 at 08:30:48 (UTC).

Skinner vs. Brookfield Sheffield Inc

Case Summary

On 01/14/2010 Skinner filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Brookfield Sheffield Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PALILEO, CHRISTINE

CARSON, RONALD

PALILEO, RAYMOND

BAO, DINGJIU

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

BROOKFIELD BARRINGTON LLC

BROOKFIELD SHEFFIELD INC

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HNR FRAMING SYSTEMS

HOUSE SUPPLY INC

BROOKFIELD BARRINGTON LLC

BROOKFIELD SHEFFIELD INC

TOMKINS INDUSTRIES INC; DBA : LASCO BATHWARE

RAY WHITE CEMENT

WESTERN IMAGE PAINTING INC

ROSSI CONCRETE INC

DON ELECTRIC INC

TORRES TILE INC; ESA : NORTH COUNTY TILE

BUILDER SERVICES GROUP INC; FDBA : MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES CENTRAL INC;ESA : PARAGON INSULATION

DAVE NORTON GRADING

MAYER ROOFING INC

Intervenors

ZURICH SPECIALTIES LONDON LIMITED

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEE ASSOCIATION

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDES, DAVID B JR

Cross Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GETTY, WILLIAM C

TYLER, BRANDY P

SQUILLARO, THOMAS S

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

Intervenor Attorneys

GREGORY, GILLIAN L

FURCOLO, REGAN

FARMER, JOHN T

Other Attorneys

SPERLING, STEVEN D

LIN, WENDY J

MARSHALL, THOMAS A

EUBANK, BRET

LUHRING, SUSAN E

PHILLIPS, MARK C

QUILLIGAN, BRUCE J

HORTON, LINCOLN V

CANNON, CATHERINE M

UREMOVICH, MARK F

GOLD, CARLEIGH L

NORRIS, SUZANNE T

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 05/22/17 - volume 2 of 2

Case File Contents as of 05/22/17 - volume 2 of 2

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 2

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 2

Notice to Filing Party SD

Answer submitted by Burney & Son Plumbing Inc rejected on 09/01/2010.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/30/2010 09:00:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Western Overhead Doors on Cross-Complaint filed by Brookfield Sheffield Inc; Brookfield Barrington LLC; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc .

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to North County Tile on Cross-Complaint filed by Brookfield Sheffield Inc; Brookfield Barrington LLC; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc .

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Macord Construction Inc on Cross-Complaint filed by Brookfield Sheffield Inc; Brookfield Barrington LLC; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc .

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Burney & Son Plumbing Inc on Cross-Complaint filed by Brookfield Sheffield Inc; Brookfield Barrington LLC; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc .

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Burney & Son Plumbing Inc on Cross-Complaint filed by Brookfield Sheffield Inc; Brookfield Barrington LLC; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc .

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Entry of Default submitted by Brookfield Sheffield Inc; Brookfield Barrington LLC; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc rejected on 05/10/2011. Refers to: AJK Installations

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/11/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 05/27/2011 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/19/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 Luis R. Vargas.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-63 Luis R. Vargas.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 12/21/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in C-63 before Luis R. Vargas at Central.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 01/25/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in C-63 before Luis R. Vargas at Central.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/04/2011 10:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/02/2012 10:00:00 AM.

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 05/22/17 - volume 2 of 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lien (ED CV 13-00245 VAP) filed by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Fund. Filed By: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Fund (Interested Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by USF Insurance Company. Filed By: USF Insurance Company (Intervenor)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by USF Insurance Company. Filed By: USF Insurance Company (Intervenor)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention dismissed with prejudice as to USF Insurance Company.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by USF Insurance Company. Filed By: USF Insurance Company (Intervenor)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention dismissed without prejudice as to California Insurance Guarantee Association.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by California Insurance Guarantee Association. Filed By: California Insurance Guarantee Association (Intervenor)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2013
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Brookfield Sheffield Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
372 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketAnswer (Answer to First Amended Complaint) filed by Brookfield Barrington LLC; Brookfield Sheffield Inc; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc. Refers to: Skinner, John; Skinner, Lisa Filed By: Brookfield Barrington LLC (Defendant); Brookfield Sheffield Inc (Defendant); Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Skinner, John. Refers to: Brookfield Sheffield Inc Filed By: Skinner, John (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Skinner, John. Refers to: Brookfield Barrington LLC Filed By: Skinner, John (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Skinner, John. Refers to: BROOKFIELD HOMES SAN DIEGO INC Filed By: Skinner, John (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First Amended) filed by Skinner, John; Skinner, Lisa; Berger, Alfred; Berger, Charlotte; Carson, Ronald; Dang, Johnny; Gerges, Ehab; Gerges, Nevine; McCoy, Russell; Paul, Clark; Paul, Janet; Simmons, Jim; Simmons, Kimberly; Westland, Steven; Westland, kristine; Wilks, Jeremy; Wilks, Michelle; Meng, Hsieng; Ming, Wei; Yu, Lei; Bao, Dingjiu; Greene, Kevin; Greene, Michelle; Palileo, Raymond; Palileo, Christine; Pleick, John; Pleick, Lena. Refers to: Brookfield Barrington LLC; Brookfield Homes San Diego Inc; Brookfield Sheffield Inc; Sunstate Tile Contractors Inc Filed By: Skinner, John (Plaintiff); Skinner, Lisa (Plaintiff); Berger, Alfred (Plaintiff); Berger, Charlotte (Plaintiff); Carson, Ronald (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Vargas, Luis.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Skinner, John; Skinner, Lisa; Berger, Alfred; Berger, Charlotte; Carson, Ronald; Dang, Johnny; Gerges, Nevine; McCoy, Russell; Paul, Janet; Paul, Clark; Simmons, Jim; Simmons, Kimberly; Westland, Steven; Westland, Kristine; Wilks, Jeremy; Wilks, Michelle. Refers to: Gerges, Ehab; Brookfield Sheffield Inc; BROOKFIELD HOMES SAN DIEGO INC Filed By: Skinner, John (Plaintiff); Skinner, Lisa (Plaintiff); Berger, Alfred (Plaintiff); Berger, Charlotte (Plaintiff); Carson, Ronald (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Skinner, John; Skinner, Lisa; Berger, Alfred; Berger, Charlotte; Carson, Ronald; Dang, Johnny; Gerges, Nevine; McCoy, Russell; Paul, Janet; Paul, Clark; Simmons, Jim; Simmons, Kimberly; Westland, Steven; Westland, Kristine; Wilks, Jeremy; Wilks, Michelle. Refers to: Gerges, Ehab; Brookfield Sheffield Inc; BROOKFIELD HOMES SAN DIEGO INC Filed By: Skinner, John (Plaintiff); Skinner, Lisa (Plaintiff); Berger, Alfred (Plaintiff); Berger, Charlotte (Plaintiff); Carson, Ronald (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed by Skinner, John; Skinner, Lisa; Berger, Alfred; Berger, Charlotte; Carson, Ronald; Dang, Johnny; Gerges, Nevine; McCoy, Russell; Paul, Janet; Paul, Clark; Simmons, Jim; Simmons, Kimberly; Westland, Steven; Westland, Kristine; Wilks, Jeremy; Wilks, Michelle. Refers to: Gerges, Ehab; Brookfield Sheffield Inc; BROOKFIELD HOMES SAN DIEGO INC Filed By: Skinner, John (Plaintiff); Skinner, Lisa (Plaintiff); Berger, Alfred (Plaintiff); Berger, Charlotte (Plaintiff); Carson, Ronald (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less