This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 16:39:06 (UTC).

Singletary vs. RBK HOLDINGS INC

Case Summary

On 06/29/2012 Singletary filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RBK HOLDINGS INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-EC

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Singletary, David

Defendants

Bradley Self Storage LP

RBK HOLDINGS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Potter, Mark D

Attorney at CENTER FOR DISABILITY ACCESS

9845 Erma Road 300

San Diego, CA 92131

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Singletary, David. Refers to: RBK HOLDINGS INC; Bradley Self Storage LP

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Singletary, David. Refers to: RBK HOLDINGS INC; Bradley Self Storage LP

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Singletary, David.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Singletary, David.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Singletary, David. Refers to: Bradley Self Storage LP

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Singletary, David. Refers to: RBK HOLDINGS INC

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 11/02/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Singletary, David.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Singletary, David, on 07/03/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Singletary, David, on 07/03/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Singletary, David. Filed By: Singletary, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 11/02/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 11/02/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Singletary, David. Refers to: RBK HOLDINGS INC Filed By: Singletary, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Singletary, David. Refers to: Bradley Self Storage LP Filed By: Singletary, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Singletary, David. Filed By: Singletary, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Singletary, David. Filed By: Singletary, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Singletary, David. Filed By: Singletary, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Singletary, David. Refers to: RBK HOLDINGS INC; Bradley Self Storage LP Filed By: Singletary, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Singletary, David. Refers to: RBK HOLDINGS INC; Bradley Self Storage LP Filed By: Singletary, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.