This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/11/2021 at 02:14:09 (UTC).

Singh vs HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Singh filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Singh, Gurmel

Defendants

HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC

SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC; DBA : HLTON SAN DIEGO BAYFRONT

SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC

HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC; DBA : HILTON SAN DIEGO BAYFRONT

HLT Conrad Domestic LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley, Shanie Nicole

Attorney at SHANIE N BRADLEY & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Singh, Gurmel.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Singh, Gurmel.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Singh, Gurmel. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC

Notice - Other

Notice of Change of Firm Name (AMENDED) filed by Singh, Gurmel.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (not entered) filed by Singh, Gurmel. Refers to: HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Singh, Gurmel. Refers to: SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Singh, Gurmel. Refers to: HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Singh, Gurmel. Refers to: SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC

Notice - Other

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Singh, Gurmel.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Singh, Gurmel. Refers to: HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC; HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC; SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC; SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Singh, Gurmel.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Singh, Gurmel.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Singh, Gurmel. Refers to: HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC Filed By: Singh, Gurmel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Singh, Gurmel. Refers to: SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC Filed By: Singh, Gurmel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name (AMENDED) filed by Singh, Gurmel. Filed By: Singh, Gurmel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (not entered) filed by Singh, Gurmel. Refers to: HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC Filed By: Singh, Gurmel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Singh, Gurmel. Refers to: SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC Filed By: Singh, Gurmel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Singh, Gurmel. Filed By: Singh, Gurmel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Singh, Gurmel. Filed By: Singh, Gurmel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name filed by Singh, Gurmel. Filed By: Singh, Gurmel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Singh, Gurmel. Refers to: HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC; HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC; SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC; SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC; HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic LLC Filed By: Singh, Gurmel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Singh, Gurmel. Filed By: Singh, Gurmel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Singh, Gurmel. Filed By: Singh, Gurmel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shanie N Bradley