Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 09:30:59 (UTC).

Simpkins vs The Wolf Firm

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Simpkins filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against The Wolf Firm. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Simpkins, Michelle A

Simpkins Jr, Terry J

Defendants

Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB; DBA : Christiana Trust

The Wolf Firm

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saunders, Gary S

Attorney at SAUNDERS LAW GROUP

Defendant Attorney

KLEIN, BRADFORD E

 

Court Documents

Notice of Errata re default

Notice of Errata filed by Simpkins, Michelle A; Simpkins, Terry J Jr.

Demurrer (Motions)

Demurrer (05/07/2021) filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Simpkins, Michelle A; Simpkins, Terry J Jr. Refers to: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB on Complaint filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr; Simpkins, Michelle A .

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Simpkins, Michelle A; Simpkins, Terry J Jr. Refers to: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB

Declaration of Due Diligence

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Simpkins, Michelle A; Simpkins, Terry J Jr. Refers to: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB on Complaint filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr; Simpkins, Michelle A .

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (**NOT ENTERED**) filed by Simpkins, Michelle A; Simpkins, Terry J Jr. Refers to: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Simpkins, Michelle A; Simpkins, Terry J Jr.

Defendant The Wolf Firm's Declaration re nonmonetary status

Declaration - Other filed by The Wolf Firm.

Proof of Service re The Wolf Firm

Proof of Service filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr.

Proof of Service re Wilmington

Proof of Service filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr; Simpkins, Michelle A. Refers to: The Wolf Firm; Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr; Simpkins, Michelle A. Refers to: The Wolf Firm; Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr; Simpkins, Michelle A. Refers to: The Wolf Firm; Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer (05/07/2021) filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. Filed By: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata filed by Simpkins, Michelle A; Simpkins, Terry J Jr. Filed By: Simpkins, Michelle A (Plaintiff); Simpkins, Terry J Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (**NOT ENTERED**) filed by Simpkins, Michelle A; Simpkins, Terry J Jr. Refers to: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB Filed By: Simpkins, Michelle A (Plaintiff); Simpkins, Terry J Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Simpkins, Michelle A; Simpkins, Terry J Jr. Filed By: Simpkins, Michelle A (Plaintiff); Simpkins, Terry J Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Simpkins, Michelle A; Simpkins, Terry J Jr. Refers to: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB Filed By: Simpkins, Michelle A (Plaintiff); Simpkins, Terry J Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Simpkins, Michelle A; Simpkins, Terry J Jr. Refers to: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB Filed By: Simpkins, Michelle A (Plaintiff); Simpkins, Terry J Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default was denied as to Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB on Complaint filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr; Simpkins, Michelle A .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr. Filed By: Simpkins, Terry J Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr. Filed By: Simpkins, Terry J Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by The Wolf Firm. Filed By: The Wolf Firm (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr; Simpkins, Michelle A. Refers to: The Wolf Firm; Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB Filed By: Simpkins, Terry J Jr (Plaintiff); Simpkins, Michelle A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr; Simpkins, Michelle A. Refers to: The Wolf Firm; Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB Filed By: Simpkins, Terry J Jr (Plaintiff); Simpkins, Michelle A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Simpkins, Terry J Jr; Simpkins, Michelle A. Refers to: The Wolf Firm; Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB Filed By: Simpkins, Terry J Jr (Plaintiff); Simpkins, Michelle A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WOLF FIRM is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLEIN BRADFORD