This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:31:37 (UTC).

Silver Mountain Maintenance Association vs. Alpine Inn LLC

Case Summary

On 02/19/2015 Silver Mountain Maintenance Association filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Alpine Inn LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Silver Mountain Maintenance Association

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Respondents

Alpine Inn, LLC

CESN Communities LLC

CESN Construction Inc

Cuevas, Omar

Romaya, Walid E

AJX AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING

MORGAN DEVELOPMENT INC

MSR CONSTRUCTION INC

JUAN ENRIQUE LOPEZ; DBA : ALL TYPES OF BASEBOARD

SAM PLUMBING ENTERPRISES INC

AC PAVING & GRADING INC

GARCIA BROTHERS WATERPROOFING INC

CLARE'S ROOFING SERVICE

RONCES-MCKINNEY PAINTING INC

ALPINE INN LLC

H & A PARTNERS LP

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Respondent

AC PAVING & GRADING INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CESN Communities LLC

CESN Construction Inc

Cuevas, Omar

Romaya, Walid E

ALPINE INN LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Cuevas, Omar

Romaya, Walid E

AJX AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING

MORGAN DEVELOPMENT INC

MSR CONSTRUCTION INC

JUAN ENRIQUE LOPEZ; DBA : ALL TYPES OF BASEBOARD

SAM PLUMBING ENTERPRISES INC

AC PAVING & GRADING INC

GARCIA BROTHERS WATERPROOFING INC

CLARE'S ROOFING SERVICE

RONCES-MCKINNEY PAINTING INC

TD INC

KENNEDY ROOFING

CALIFORNIA CONVERSION CONSULTANTS

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Naumann, William H; Shiu, Loren K

Attorney at THE NAUMANN LAW FIRM PC

10731 Treena 101

San Diego, CA 92131

NAUMANN, WILLIAM H

Attorney at THE NAUMANN LAW FIRM PC

10731 Treena 101

San Diego, CA 92131

SHIU, LOREN K

Attorney at THE NAUMAN LAW FIRM PC

Treena St

San Diego, CA 92131

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GLUCKSMAN, RICHARD H

Attorney at CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN DEAN ROEB & BARGER

11900 W Olympic Blvd #800

Los Angeles, CA 90064

LAZO, MARC Y

Attorney at WILSON HARVEY BROWNDORF LLP

1900 Mail Street Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92614

KAHN, BRIAN

11900 W Olympic Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90064

LEENERTS, ERIC M

225 Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

BRUMFIELD, CHARLES E

1725 Gillespie Way

El Cajon, CA 92020

HOUT, GREGORY J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY J HOUT

World Trade Dr

San Diego, CA 92128

STEVENS, TODD F

402 W Broadway #1820

San Diego, CA 92101

FELD, JASON DANIEL

3 Hutton Centre Drive Suite 685

Santa Ana, CA 92707

MOON, JACKIE

HERNQUIST II, WILLIAM C

Attorney at HERNQUIST & ASSOCIATES

8407 La Mesa Blvd

La Mesa, CA 91942

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HOUT, GREGORY J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY J HOUT

World Trade Dr

San Diego, CA 92128

Other Attorneys

CANNON, CATHERINE M

Attorney at AUSTIN BROWNWOOD CANNON & SANTA CRUZ

1615 Murray Canyon Road 550

San Diego, CA 92108

EUM, DAVID

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF CRAIG A HOLTZ

100 W Broadway 1150

Glendale, CA 91210

SPOONER, GABRIEL S.

O'BRIEN, PATRICK

BURTON, MICHELLE L

Attorney at SHOECRAFT BURTON LLP

1230 Columbia Street 1140

San Diego, CA 92101

SCHACHTER, ROBERT

JOSEPH, DANE F

501 W Broadway 2060

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by The Rock Stone And Tile Inc.

Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee

Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee (Recommendation and Order for DMA Construction to Augment Expert Witness List (Signed)) filed by ROBERTS, MICHAEL J.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Silver Mountain Maintenance Association. Refers to: Alpine Inn LLC

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 08/28/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Garcia Brothers Waterproofing Inc.

Notice of Settlement

Notice - Other (Settlement) filed by Familia Primera LP; H & A Partners LP; Rock Hunter Inc; Ayyad, William G.

Proposed Order

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement submitted by Custom Doors & Moldings; Juan Enrique Lopez received but not filed on 07/14/2017.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 02/23/2018 08:30:00 AM.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Alpine Inn LLC; Alpine Inn LLC; CESN Communities LLC; CESN Communities LLC; CESN Construction Inc; CESN Construction Inc. Refers to: AJX Air Conditioning and Heating

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 04/21/2017 at 09:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Supporting Documents

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Supporting Documents filed by Alpine Inn LLC; CESN Communities LLC; CESN Construction Inc.

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (Signed as modified) filed by Juan Enrique Lopez; Custom Doors & Moldings. Refers to: Silver Mountain Maintenance Association; Alpine Inn LLC

Request for Entry of Default #2280323

[Another document for ROA# 178]

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complanit) filed by Garcia Brothers Waterproofing Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Cuevas, Omar; Romaya, Walid E.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Silver Mountain Maintenance Association.

Recommendation and Order to file an amendment to the complaint

Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee submitted by Silver Mountain Maintenance Association received but not filed on 08/21/2017.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

368 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • Amended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Romaya, Walid E .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to Silver Mountain Maintenance Association.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to AC Paving & Grading Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Complaint in Intervention dismissed without prejudice as to Interstate Insurance Group.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to California Conversion Consultants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Romaya, Walid E .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Cuevas, Omar .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Alpine Inn LLC; CESN Communities LLC; CESN Construction Inc. Refers to: Garcia Brothers Waterproofing Inc Filed By: Alpine Inn LLC (Cross - Complainant); CESN Communities LLC (Cross - Complainant); CESN Construction Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to The Rock Stone And Tile Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
500 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Silver Mountain Maintenance Association. Refers to: CESN Construction Inc Filed By: Silver Mountain Maintenance Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Silver Mountain Maintenance Association. Refers to: Romaya, Walid Filed By: Silver Mountain Maintenance Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Silver Mountain Maintenance Association. Refers to: Cuevas, Omar Filed By: Silver Mountain Maintenance Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/07/2015 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Silver Mountain Maintenance Association. Refers to: Alpine Inn LLC; CESN Construction Inc; CESN Communities LLC; Romaya, Walid; Cuevas, Omar Filed By: Silver Mountain Maintenance Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Silver Mountain Maintenance Association. Refers to: Alpine Inn LLC; CESN Construction Inc; CESN Communities LLC; Romaya, Walid; Cuevas, Omar Filed By: Silver Mountain Maintenance Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Silver Mountain Maintenance Association. Refers to: Alpine Inn LLC; CESN Construction Inc; CESN Communities LLC; Romaya, Walid; Cuevas, Omar Filed By: Silver Mountain Maintenance Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.