This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 08:08:55 (UTC).

Siegler vs Arrechea

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 Siegler filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Arrechea. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Siegler, Denise

Siegler, Mark

Defendants

Arrechea, Raul E

RAUL EDUARDO ARRECHEA DDS INC; DBA : Smart Dental Care

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stallone, David O

Defendant Attorney

Kamel, Brian P

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Siegler, Denise; Siegler, Mark. Refers to: Arrechea, Raul; RAUL EDUARDO ARRECHEA DDS INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Siegler, Denise; Siegler, Mark. Refers to: Arrechea, Raul; RAUL EDUARDO ARRECHEA DDS INC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Siegler, Denise; Siegler, Mark. Refers to: Arrechea, Raul; RAUL EDUARDO ARRECHEA DDS INC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Siegler, Denise; Siegler, Mark. Refers to: RAUL EDUARDO ARRECHEA DDS INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Siegler, Denise; Siegler, Mark. Refers to: Arrechea, Raul

Answer

Answer filed by Arrechea, Raul E; RAUL EDUARDO ARRECHEA DDS INC.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Arrechea, Raul E; RAUL EDUARDO ARRECHEA DDS INC.; Filed By: Arrechea, Raul E (Defendant); RAUL EDUARDO ARRECHEA DDS INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Siegler, Denise; Siegler, Mark. Refers to: Arrechea, Raul; Filed By: Siegler, Denise (Plaintiff); Siegler, Mark (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Siegler, Denise; Siegler, Mark. Refers to: RAUL EDUARDO ARRECHEA DDS INC; Filed By: Siegler, Denise (Plaintiff); Siegler, Mark (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/12/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Siegler, Denise; Siegler, Mark. Refers to: Arrechea, Raul; RAUL EDUARDO ARRECHEA DDS INC; Filed By: Siegler, Denise (Plaintiff); Siegler, Mark (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Siegler, Denise; Siegler, Mark. Refers to: Arrechea, Raul; RAUL EDUARDO ARRECHEA DDS INC; Filed By: Siegler, Denise (Plaintiff); Siegler, Mark (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Siegler, Denise; Siegler, Mark. Refers to: Arrechea, Raul; RAUL EDUARDO ARRECHEA DDS INC; Filed By: Siegler, Denise (Plaintiff); Siegler, Mark (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less