This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 10:54:35 (UTC).

Shipware LLC vs Styles Logistics Inc

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 Shipware LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Styles Logistics Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shipware LLC

Defendant

Styles Logistics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fitzgerald, Kenneth Moore

Attorney at FITZGERALD KNAIER LLP

402 W Broadway 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Shipware LLC. Refers to: Styles Logistics Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shipware LLC. Refers to: Styles Logistics Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Shipware LLC. Refers to: Styles Logistics Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Shipware LLC. Refers to: Styles Logistics Inc

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Shipware LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Styles Logistics Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Shipware LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Shipware LLC. Filed By: Shipware LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Shipware LLC. Refers to: Styles Logistics Inc Filed By: Shipware LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Shipware LLC. Refers to: Styles Logistics Inc Filed By: Shipware LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shipware LLC. Refers to: Styles Logistics Inc Filed By: Shipware LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Shipware LLC. Refers to: Styles Logistics Inc Filed By: Shipware LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fitzgerald, Kenneth Moore