This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 07:07:52 (UTC).

Shelly vs Jeffrey

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Shelly filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jeffrey. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shelly, Carole Grace

Defendants

Jeffrey, Bruce Alan

Jeffrey, Bruce Alan; DBA : Bruce Jeffrey Construction;ESA : Jeffrey, Bruce Alan;DBA : Bruce Alan Jeffrey Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rhames, Michael R

Attorney at MICHAEL R RHAMES & ASSOCIATES PC

600 Corporate Pointe Suite 1170

Culver City, CA 90230

Defendant Attorney

Reisinger, Robert Lee

Attorney at FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR One World Trade Center Twenty Seventh Floor Long Beach CA

1 World Trade Center Twenty 7Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802-2700

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/02/2022 10:15:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Shelly, Carole Grace.

Notice of Errata

Notice of Errata filed by Shelly, Carole Grace.

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Jeffrey, Bruce Alan; Jeffrey, Bruce Alan.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Jeffrey, Bruce Alan; Jeffrey, Bruce Alan.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Jeffrey, Bruce Alan; Jeffrey, Bruce Alan.

Answer

Answer filed by Jeffrey, Bruce Alan; Jeffrey, Bruce Alan.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Shelly, Carole Grace.

Proof of Service Bruce Alan Jeffrey

Proof of Service filed by Shelly, Carole Grace.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Shelly, Carole Grace.

Application and Order Correcting Court Record

Application and Order Correcting Court Record (ROA 3) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Complaint For Damages

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shelly, Carole Grace.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/02/2022 10:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketJury demanded by Defendant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 08:30AM before Judge Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 09:00AM before Judge Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Shelly, Carole Grace.; Filed By: Shelly, Carole Grace (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata filed by Shelly, Carole Grace.; Filed By: Shelly, Carole Grace (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Jeffrey, Bruce Alan; Jeffrey, Bruce Alan.; Filed By: Jeffrey, Bruce Alan (Defendant); Jeffrey, Bruce Alan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Shelly, Carole Grace.; Filed By: Shelly, Carole Grace (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Correcting Court Record (ROA 3) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shelly, Carole Grace.; Filed By: Shelly, Carole Grace (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Shelly, Carole Grace. Refers to: Jeffrey, Bruce; Jeffrey, Bruce; Filed By: Shelly, Carole Grace (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RHAMES MICHAEL R. ESQ.