Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 02:38:24 (UTC).

Severance vs Homeaway.Com Inc

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Severance filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Homeaway Com Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Severance, Carol

Berger, Les

Defendants

VRBO.COM

EXPEDIA INC

HOMEAWAY.COM INC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Severance, Carol; Berger, Les. Refers to: HOMEAWAY.COM INC; VRBO.COM; EXPEDIA INC

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • HearingLocation: 1601; Event Type: Small Claims Court Trial - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in 1601 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCertified Mail Green Card Tracking Numbers filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Severance, Carol; Berger, Les. Refers to: HOMEAWAY.COM INC; VRBO.COM; EXPEDIA INC Filed By: Severance, Carol (Plaintiff); Berger, Les (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Expedia, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where HOMEAWAY.COM INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant