Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 07:14:51 (UTC).

Serna vs Volvo Cars of North America LLC

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 Serna filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Volvo Cars of North America LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Serna, Elise M

Serna, Steve

Defendants

San Diego V Inc; DBA : Volvo Cars San Diego

Volvo Cars of North America LLC

Volvo Car USA LLC; ESA : Volvo Cars of North America LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wirtz, Richard M

Defendant Attorney

Henderson, Austin Robert

 

Court Documents

San Diego V.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial

Answer (to complaint) filed by San Diego V Inc.

Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial

Answer filed by Volvo Cars of North America LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Serna, Elise M; Serna, Steve. Refers to: Volvo Cars of North America LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Serna, Elise M; Serna, Steve. Refers to: San Diego V Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Serna, Steve; Serna, Elise M. Refers to: Volvo Cars of North America LLC; San Diego V Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Serna, Steve; Serna, Elise M. Refers to: Volvo Cars of North America LLC; San Diego V Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Serna, Steve; Serna, Elise M. Refers to: Volvo Cars of North America LLC; San Diego V Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (to complaint) filed by San Diego V Inc. Filed By: San Diego V Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Volvo Cars of North America LLC. Filed By: Volvo Cars of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Serna, Elise M; Serna, Steve. Refers to: San Diego V Inc Filed By: Serna, Elise M (Plaintiff); Serna, Steve (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Serna, Elise M; Serna, Steve. Refers to: Volvo Car USA LLC Filed By: Serna, Elise M (Plaintiff); Serna, Steve (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/24/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Serna, Steve; Serna, Elise M. Refers to: Volvo Car USA LLC; San Diego V Inc Filed By: Serna, Steve (Plaintiff); Serna, Elise M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Serna, Steve; Serna, Elise M. Refers to: Volvo Car USA LLC; San Diego V Inc Filed By: Serna, Steve (Plaintiff); Serna, Elise M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Serna, Steve; Serna, Elise M. Refers to: Volvo Car USA LLC; San Diego V Inc Filed By: Serna, Steve (Plaintiff); Serna, Elise M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Diego V Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA LLC is a litigant