This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 03:53:13 (UTC).

Seo vs. Mawad

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Seo filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Mawad. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard E. L. Strauss and James A Mangione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Richard E. L. Strauss

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seo, Chong Soon

Defendants

C & H Trust Deed Service

Khan, Mac Umer

Lahoud E Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004

Lawyers Title Company

Soumaia S Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004

US LENDING & COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kim, Andrew

3470 Wilshire Blvd 885

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Seo, Chong Soon. Refers to: Lahoud E Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; Soumaia S Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; US LENDING & COMPANY INC; Khan, Mac; Lawyers Title Company; C & H Trust Deed Service

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Seo, Chong Soon. Refers to: Lahoud E Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; Soumaia S Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; US LENDING & COMPANY INC; Khan, Mac; Lawyers Title Company; C & H Trust Deed Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Seo, Chong Soon. Refers to: Lahoud E Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; Soumaia S Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; US LENDING & COMPANY INC; Khan, Mac; Lawyers Title Company; C & H Trust Deed Service

Complaint

Complaint filed by Seo, Chong Soon. Refers to: Lahoud E Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; Soumaia S Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; US LENDING & COMPANY INC; Khan, Mac; Lawyers Title Company; C & H Trust Deed Service

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Seo, Chong Soon.

Ex Parte Motion and Motion to Consolidate Pending Related Cases

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Seo, Chong Soon.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Mangione, James for 04/22/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-75 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketThe Ex Parte was rescheduled to 10/12/2021 at 08:45:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 10/07/2021 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Seo, Chong Soon. Filed By: Seo, Chong Soon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Seo, Chong Soon. Filed By: Seo, Chong Soon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Seo, Chong Soon. Refers to: Lahoud E Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; Soumaia S Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; US LENDING & COMPANY INC; Khan, Mac; Lawyers Title Company; C & H Trust Deed Service Filed By: Seo, Chong Soon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Seo, Chong Soon. Refers to: Lahoud E Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; Soumaia S Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; US LENDING & COMPANY INC; Khan, Mac; Lawyers Title Company; C & H Trust Deed Service Filed By: Seo, Chong Soon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Seo, Chong Soon. Refers to: Lahoud E Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; Soumaia S Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; US LENDING & COMPANY INC; Khan, Mac; Lawyers Title Company; C & H Trust Deed Service Filed By: Seo, Chong Soon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by Seo, Chong Soon. Refers to: Lahoud E Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; Soumaia S Mawad Trustee of the Lahoud E and Soumaia S Mawad Family Trust dated January 10 2004; US LENDING & COMPANY INC; Khan, Mac; Lawyers Title Company; C & H Trust Deed Service Filed By: Seo, Chong Soon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where C & H TRUST DEED SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kim, Andrew