This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 19:58:36 (UTC).

Seitrich vs. Emerald Textiles LLC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2015 Seitrich filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Emerald Textiles LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seitrich, Grant

Defendant

Emerald Textiles LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THURMER, MATTHEW A

Defendant Attorney

OSTIN, PENNY T

 

Court Documents

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Seitrich, Grant.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Seitrich, Grant.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Case Management Statement and Notice of Posting Jury Fees) filed by Emerald Textiles LLC. Refers to: Seitrich, Grant

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Emerald Textiles LLC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Emerald Textiles LLC.

Answer

Answer (with Proof of Service) filed by Emerald Textiles LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Seitrich, Grant. Refers to: Emerald Textiles LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Seitrich, Grant. Refers to: Emerald Textiles LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Seitrich, Grant. Refers to: Emerald Textiles LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Seitrich, Grant. Refers to: Emerald Textiles LLC

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Seitrich, Grant.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/08/2016
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Seitrich, Grant. Filed By: Seitrich, Grant (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2016
View Court Documents

DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2016

DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2016
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2016
View Court Documents

DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2016

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/25/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2016
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Seitrich, Grant. Filed By: Seitrich, Grant (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2016
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement filed by Seitrich, Grant. Filed By: Seitrich, Grant (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2016
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service (Case Management Statement and Notice of Posting Jury Fees) filed by Emerald Textiles LLC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2016
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Emerald Textiles LLC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2016
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement filed by Emerald Textiles LLC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2015
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer (with Proof of Service) filed by Emerald Textiles LLC. Filed By: Emerald Textiles LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2015
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Seitrich, Grant. Refers to: Emerald Textiles LLC Filed By: Seitrich, Grant (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2015
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2015

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/25/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2015

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pressman, Joel.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2015

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2015
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Seitrich, Grant. Refers to: Emerald Textiles LLC Filed By: Seitrich, Grant (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2015
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Seitrich, Grant. Refers to: Emerald Textiles LLC Filed By: Seitrich, Grant (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2015
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Seitrich, Grant. Refers to: Emerald Textiles LLC Filed By: Seitrich, Grant (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less